+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB613 is now Act 700
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
April 5, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor