+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- EXPUNGED
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Elliott
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2015: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 14
March 23, 2015: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor