+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On November 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Bond
Amendment S2
Sponsored by K. Ingram
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Ingram
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor