+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB598 is now Act 590
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 8
March 9, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor