+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB595 is now Act 863
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Rules suspended.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor