+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB594 is now Act 1052
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1,2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1,2
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1 and 2.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Motion to rerefer back to committee passed
- Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment Chamber: House H2 Hawks 4/21/2021 10:59:33 AM PDF
Sponsored by Hawks
Amendment Chamber: House H1 Hawks 4/19/2021 11:29:59 AM PDF
Sponsored by Hawks
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
April 13, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6