+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB594 is now Act 635
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor