+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB593 is now Act 861
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4
- Rules suspended.
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S3
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S4
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Carter
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 12
March 17, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor