+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Received from the House.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor