+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and failed.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Hammer
+ − Vote
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 12