+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB576 is now Act 822
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- House Amendment No. 1 and #2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 amd 2
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Eaves
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Douglas
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2019: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 12
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor