+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as requested.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sounding of the Ballot
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Upon Sounding of the Ballot, SB571 passes
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by L. Johnson
Amendment H2
Sponsored by L. Johnson
Amendment H1
Sponsored by L. Johnson
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hendren
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor