+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The vote by which SB570 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Motion to Expunge the vote by which SB570 failed to pass. Roll call on the motion.
- Read the third time and failed.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Sullivan
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2021: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
April 12, 2021: Motion to Expunge the vote by which SB570 failed to pass. Roll call on the motion.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor