+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB567 is now Act 645
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Johnson
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 18
March 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor