+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB564 is now Act 912
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment Chamber: Senate S2 Elliott 4/9/2021 10:27:49 AM PDF
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Elliott
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor