+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB562 is now Act 929
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 19
March 9, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor