+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB56 is now Act 42
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Woods
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
January 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor