+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB56 is now Act 55
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
January 24, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor