+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB558 is now Act 693
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor