+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB549 is now Act 1022
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass, Concur in House, Amendment #1.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1.
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hawks
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2021: House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor