+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB549 is now Act 933
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor