+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB548 is now Act 932
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote
- The vote by which SB548 Failed to Pass was expunged.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 17
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor