+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB544 is now Act 995
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Crawford
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 16
March 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor