+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB543 is now Act 632
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
March 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor