+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB540 is now Act 739
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 13
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor