+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB54 is now Act 830
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor