+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB538 is now Act 686
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
March 15, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor