+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB535 is now Act 1021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass, Concur in House, Amendment #1.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment Chamber: House H1 Ray 4/14/2021 12:20:48 PM PDF
Sponsored by Ray
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Davis
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 14
April 7, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1