+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB522 is now Act 1079
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Cozart
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor