+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB52 is now Act 246
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2012: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
February 29, 2012: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1