+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB513 is now Act 704
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Johnson
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35