+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB510 failed to pass
- The vote by which SB510 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Vote
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor