+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB501 is now Act 778
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 & 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 2
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Cavenaugh
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Jett
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Johnson
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
March 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 20
March 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1