+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Children and Youth
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by S. Flowers