+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 15, 2021 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Motion for immediate consideration passed
- Read the third time and failed.
- Clincher motion failed of adoption
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Read the third time and passed.
- Sounding of the Ballot rerquested on the passage of SB485. Upon Sounding of the Ballot, SB485 passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 18
April 27, 2021: Clincher motion failed of adoption
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 17
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor