+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB478 is now Act 632
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
March 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1