+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as requested.
- Withdrawn by author.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Vote
March 16, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor