+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB460 is now Act 991
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Bragg
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 9
March 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor