+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB455 is now Act 1233
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Maloch
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Maloch
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
April 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor