+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB446 is now Act 699
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Vaught
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35