+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB442 is now Act 943
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Pitsch
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hendren
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor