+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB436 is now Act 482
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
March 6, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor