+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB43 is now Act 90
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Johnson
Amendment S2
Sponsored by D. Johnson
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 7, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35