+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB43 is now Act 226
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor