+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB426 is now Act 600
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
February 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1