+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB425 is now Act 557
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 17
March 13, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor