+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB423 is now Act 554
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 2, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1