+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB412 is now Act 829
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor