+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB411 is now Act 375
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
February 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor