+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB407 is now Act 551
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
March 16, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1